89 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Rodríguez Martí, Manuel | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico | Ex Secretario General del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 24/05/2022 | 01/06/2022 | 31/05/2024 | 6600,63€ | 164729,87€ |
Serena Sender, Josep María | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico | Ex Presidente del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 01/03/2022 | 01/04/2022 | 31/03/2024 | 7311,78€ | 181958,40€ |
García Rodríguez, María | Ministerio de Agricultura, Pesca y Alimentación | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Medio Ambiente | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 26/12/2019 | 6601,84€ | 118833,16€ |
Nieto Ballesteros, José Antonio | Ministerio del Interior | Ex Secretario de Estado de Seguridad | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 01/01/2019 | 6549,33€ | 39295,98€ |
Rodriguez Herrer, María Elvira | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 05/10/2016 | 06/10/2016 | 27/02/2017 | 0,00€ | 48118,83€ |
Centeno Huerta, Lourdes | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 05/10/2016 | 06/10/2016 | 19/02/2017 | 0,00€ | 45245,39€ |
Albella Amigo, Sebastian | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 15/12/2020 | 16/12/2020 | 10803,09€ | 0,00€ | |
Martinez-Pina Garcia, Ana M. | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 15/12/2020 | 16/12/2020 | 10802,93€ | 0,00€ | |
Jimenez Latorre, Fernando | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Secretario de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa | 30/08/2014 | 02/09/2014 | 01/11/2014 | 6311,40€ | 12622,80€ |
Pedroche Y Rojo, Luis | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Consejero de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 01/05/2014 | 02/05/2014 | 01/05/2016 | 8640,32€ | 207713,32€ |
Name | Rodríguez Martí, Manuel |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico |
Position | Ex Secretario General del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 24/05/2022 |
Start date of perception | 01/06/2022 |
End date of perception* | 31/05/2024 |
Monthly Perception | 6600,63€ |
Total perceived* | 164729,87€ |
Name | Serena Sender, Josep María |
Ministry | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico |
Position | Ex Presidente del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 01/03/2022 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2022 |
End date of perception* | 31/03/2024 |
Monthly Perception | 7311,78€ |
Total perceived* | 181958,40€ |
Name | García Rodríguez, María |
Ministry | Ministerio de Agricultura, Pesca y Alimentación |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Medio Ambiente |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 26/12/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6601,84€ |
Total perceived* | 118833,16€ |
Name | Nieto Ballesteros, José Antonio |
Ministry | Ministerio del Interior |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Seguridad |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 01/01/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6549,33€ |
Total perceived* | 39295,98€ |
Name | Rodriguez Herrer, María Elvira |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 05/10/2016 |
Start date of perception | 06/10/2016 |
End date of perception* | 27/02/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 0,00€ |
Total perceived* | 48118,83€ |
Name | Centeno Huerta, Lourdes |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 05/10/2016 |
Start date of perception | 06/10/2016 |
End date of perception* | 19/02/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 0,00€ |
Total perceived* | 45245,39€ |
Name | Albella Amigo, Sebastian |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 15/12/2020 |
Start date of perception | 16/12/2020 |
End date of perception* | |
Monthly Perception | 10803,09€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Martinez-Pina Garcia, Ana M. |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 15/12/2020 |
Start date of perception | 16/12/2020 |
End date of perception* | |
Monthly Perception | 10802,93€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Jimenez Latorre, Fernando |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa |
Date of cessation | 30/08/2014 |
Start date of perception | 02/09/2014 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2014 |
Monthly Perception | 6311,40€ |
Total perceived* | 12622,80€ |
Name | Pedroche Y Rojo, Luis |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Consejero de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 01/05/2014 |
Start date of perception | 02/05/2014 |
End date of perception* | 01/05/2016 |
Monthly Perception | 8640,32€ |
Total perceived* | 207713,32€ |
Page 1 of 9
* For the cases of ending of the presentation