23 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Rodriguez Herrer, María Elvira | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 05/10/2016 | 06/10/2016 | 27/02/2017 | 0,00€ | 48118,83€ |
Centeno Huerta, Lourdes | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 05/10/2016 | 06/10/2016 | 19/02/2017 | 0,00€ | 45245,39€ |
Albella Amigo, Sebastian | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 15/12/2020 | 16/12/2020 | 10803,09€ | 0,00€ | |
Martinez-Pina Garcia, Ana M. | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 15/12/2020 | 16/12/2020 | 10802,93€ | 0,00€ | |
Jimenez Latorre, Fernando | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Secretario de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa | 30/08/2014 | 02/09/2014 | 01/11/2014 | 6311,40€ | 12622,80€ |
Pedroche Y Rojo, Luis | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Consejero de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 01/05/2014 | 02/05/2014 | 01/05/2016 | 8640,32€ | 207713,32€ |
Zenarrutzabeitia Beldarrain, Miren Idoia | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera CNMC | 23/09/2017 | 01/10/2017 | 30/09/2019 | 7195,74€ | 0,00€ |
Companys Sanfeliu, Ramon | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 4693,13€ | 112635,12€ |
Lorenzo Almendros, Bernardo | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Presidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 9389,94€ | 225358,56€ |
Diez Martin, Luis Miguel | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7053,95€ | 169294,80€ |
Name | Rodriguez Herrer, María Elvira |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 05/10/2016 |
Start date of perception | 06/10/2016 |
End date of perception* | 27/02/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 0,00€ |
Total perceived* | 48118,83€ |
Name | Centeno Huerta, Lourdes |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 05/10/2016 |
Start date of perception | 06/10/2016 |
End date of perception* | 19/02/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 0,00€ |
Total perceived* | 45245,39€ |
Name | Albella Amigo, Sebastian |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 15/12/2020 |
Start date of perception | 16/12/2020 |
End date of perception* | |
Monthly Perception | 10803,09€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Martinez-Pina Garcia, Ana M. |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 15/12/2020 |
Start date of perception | 16/12/2020 |
End date of perception* | |
Monthly Perception | 10802,93€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Jimenez Latorre, Fernando |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa |
Date of cessation | 30/08/2014 |
Start date of perception | 02/09/2014 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2014 |
Monthly Perception | 6311,40€ |
Total perceived* | 12622,80€ |
Name | Pedroche Y Rojo, Luis |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Consejero de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 01/05/2014 |
Start date of perception | 02/05/2014 |
End date of perception* | 01/05/2016 |
Monthly Perception | 8640,32€ |
Total perceived* | 207713,32€ |
Name | Zenarrutzabeitia Beldarrain, Miren Idoia |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera CNMC |
Date of cessation | 23/09/2017 |
Start date of perception | 01/10/2017 |
End date of perception* | 30/09/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 7195,74€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Companys Sanfeliu, Ramon |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4693,13€ |
Total perceived* | 112635,12€ |
Name | Lorenzo Almendros, Bernardo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Presidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 9389,94€ |
Total perceived* | 225358,56€ |
Name | Diez Martin, Luis Miguel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7053,95€ |
Total perceived* | 169294,80€ |
Page 1 of 3
* For the cases of ending of the presentation