4 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Benzo Sáinz, Fernando | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Secretario de Estado de Cultura | 22/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 02/07/2019 | 6131,58€ | 79710,57€ |
Marín Hellín, Marcial | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Secretario de Estado de Educación, F.P. y Universidades | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 06/06/2020 | 6848,98€ | 157183,90€ |
Cardenal Carro, Miguel | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 19/11/2016 | 02/12/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 6438,38€ | 57499,17€ |
Wert Ortega, José Ignacio | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Ministro de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | 26/06/2015 | 02/07/2015 | 01/08/2015 | 4598,79€ | 4598,79€ |
Name | Benzo Sáinz, Fernando |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Cultura |
Date of cessation | 22/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 02/07/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6131,58€ |
Total perceived* | 79710,57€ |
Name | Marín Hellín, Marcial |
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Educación, F.P. y Universidades |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 06/06/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6848,98€ |
Total perceived* | 157183,90€ |
Name | Cardenal Carro, Miguel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 19/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 02/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 31/08/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 57499,17€ |
Name | Wert Ortega, José Ignacio |
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Ministro de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Date of cessation | 26/06/2015 |
Start date of perception | 02/07/2015 |
End date of perception* | 01/08/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4598,79€ |
Total perceived* | 4598,79€ |
Page 1 of 1
1
* For the cases of ending of the presentation