89 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Wert Ortega, José Ignacio | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Ministro de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | 26/06/2015 | 02/07/2015 | 01/08/2015 | 4598,79€ | 4598,79€ |
Jimenez Latorre, Fernando | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Secretario de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa | 30/08/2014 | 02/09/2014 | 01/11/2014 | 6311,40€ | 12622,80€ |
Pedroche Y Rojo, Luis | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Consejero de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 01/05/2014 | 02/05/2014 | 01/05/2016 | 8640,32€ | 207713,32€ |
Companys Sanfeliu, Ramon | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 4693,13€ | 112635,12€ |
Lorenzo Almendros, Bernardo | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Presidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 9389,94€ | 225358,56€ |
Diez Martin, Luis Miguel | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7053,95€ | 169294,80€ |
Batalla Bejerano, Joan | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Energía | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7814,80€ | 187555,20€ |
Varela Flores, Manuel Guillermo | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 4693,13€ | 112635,12€ |
Gonzalez Lopez, Maria Jesus | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional de la Competencia | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7053,95€ | 169294,80€ |
Gonzalez Rodriguez, Jose Pascual | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 8016,29€ | 192390,96€ |
Name | Wert Ortega, José Ignacio |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Ministro de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Date of cessation | 26/06/2015 |
Start date of perception | 02/07/2015 |
End date of perception* | 01/08/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4598,79€ |
Total perceived* | 4598,79€ |
Name | Jimenez Latorre, Fernando |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa |
Date of cessation | 30/08/2014 |
Start date of perception | 02/09/2014 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2014 |
Monthly Perception | 6311,40€ |
Total perceived* | 12622,80€ |
Name | Pedroche Y Rojo, Luis |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Consejero de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 01/05/2014 |
Start date of perception | 02/05/2014 |
End date of perception* | 01/05/2016 |
Monthly Perception | 8640,32€ |
Total perceived* | 207713,32€ |
Name | Companys Sanfeliu, Ramon |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4693,13€ |
Total perceived* | 112635,12€ |
Name | Lorenzo Almendros, Bernardo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Presidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 9389,94€ |
Total perceived* | 225358,56€ |
Name | Diez Martin, Luis Miguel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7053,95€ |
Total perceived* | 169294,80€ |
Name | Batalla Bejerano, Joan |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Energía |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7814,80€ |
Total perceived* | 187555,20€ |
Name | Varela Flores, Manuel Guillermo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4693,13€ |
Total perceived* | 112635,12€ |
Name | Gonzalez Lopez, Maria Jesus |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional de la Competencia |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7053,95€ |
Total perceived* | 169294,80€ |
Name | Gonzalez Rodriguez, Jose Pascual |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 8016,29€ |
Total perceived* | 192390,96€ |
Page 8 of 9
Previous 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 Next
* For the cases of ending of the presentation