89 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Morillo Rodriguez, Rosa Ana | Ministerio de Industria y Turismo | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Turismo | 16/04/2024 | 01/05/2024 | 27/08/2025 | 7403,12€ | 0,00€ |
Alfonsín Alfonso, Jaime Luis | Casa S.M. el Rey | Ex Jefe de la Casa de S.M. El Rey | 16/02/2024 | 01/03/2024 | 28/02/2026 | 10074,80€ | 0,00€ |
Artigas Brugal,Carme | Ministerio para la Transformación Digital y de la Función Pública | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Digitalización e Inteligencia Artificial. | 27/12/2023 | 01/01/2024 | 31/12/2025 | 7403,12€ | 0,00€ |
Alvarez Peralta, Ignacio | Ministerio de Derechos Sociales y Agenda 2030 | Ex Secretario de Estado de Derechos Sociales | 28/11/2023 | 01/12/2023 | 22/12/2023 | 7306,02€ | 5357,75€ |
Rodriguez Esquerdo, Antonio Julián | Ministerio de Justicia | Ex Secretario de Estado de Justicia | 28/11/2023 | 01/12/2023 | 21/10/2025 | 7403,12€ | 0,00€ |
Rodriguez Martínez, Angela | Ministerio de Igualdad | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Igualdad y Contra la Violencia de Género | 22/11/2023 | 01/12/2023 | 30/11/2025 | 7403,12€ | 0,00€ |
Montero Gil, Irene María | Ministerio de Igualdad | Ex Ministra de Igualdad | 19/11/2023 | 01/12/2023 | 30/11/2025 | 5346,00€ | 0,00€ |
Garzón Espinosa, Alberto Carlos | Ministerio de Consumo | Ex Ministro de Consumo | 19/11/2023 | 01/12/2023 | 30/11/2025 | 5346,00€ | 0,00€ |
Franco Pardo, José Manuel | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 13/06/2023 | 01/07/2023 | 22/07/2023 | 7306,02€ | 5357,75€ |
Maroto Illera, Reyes | Ministerio de Industria, Comercio y Turismo | Ex Ministra de Industria, Comercio y Turismo | 27/03/2023 | 01/04/2023 | 16/06/2023 | 5294,34€ | 13412,33€ |
Name | Morillo Rodriguez, Rosa Ana |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria y Turismo |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Turismo |
Date of cessation | 16/04/2024 |
Start date of perception | 01/05/2024 |
End date of perception* | 27/08/2025 |
Monthly Perception | 7403,12€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Alfonsín Alfonso, Jaime Luis |
Ministry | Casa S.M. el Rey |
Position | Ex Jefe de la Casa de S.M. El Rey |
Date of cessation | 16/02/2024 |
Start date of perception | 01/03/2024 |
End date of perception* | 28/02/2026 |
Monthly Perception | 10074,80€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Artigas Brugal,Carme |
Ministry | Ministerio para la Transformación Digital y de la Función Pública |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Digitalización e Inteligencia Artificial. |
Date of cessation | 27/12/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/01/2024 |
End date of perception* | 31/12/2025 |
Monthly Perception | 7403,12€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Alvarez Peralta, Ignacio |
Ministry | Ministerio de Derechos Sociales y Agenda 2030 |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Derechos Sociales |
Date of cessation | 28/11/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/12/2023 |
End date of perception* | 22/12/2023 |
Monthly Perception | 7306,02€ |
Total perceived* | 5357,75€ |
Name | Rodriguez Esquerdo, Antonio Julián |
Ministry | Ministerio de Justicia |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Justicia |
Date of cessation | 28/11/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/12/2023 |
End date of perception* | 21/10/2025 |
Monthly Perception | 7403,12€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Rodriguez Martínez, Angela |
Ministry | Ministerio de Igualdad |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Igualdad y Contra la Violencia de Género |
Date of cessation | 22/11/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/12/2023 |
End date of perception* | 30/11/2025 |
Monthly Perception | 7403,12€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Montero Gil, Irene María |
Ministry | Ministerio de Igualdad |
Position | Ex Ministra de Igualdad |
Date of cessation | 19/11/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/12/2023 |
End date of perception* | 30/11/2025 |
Monthly Perception | 5346,00€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Garzón Espinosa, Alberto Carlos |
Ministry | Ministerio de Consumo |
Position | Ex Ministro de Consumo |
Date of cessation | 19/11/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/12/2023 |
End date of perception* | 30/11/2025 |
Monthly Perception | 5346,00€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Franco Pardo, José Manuel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 13/06/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2023 |
End date of perception* | 22/07/2023 |
Monthly Perception | 7306,02€ |
Total perceived* | 5357,75€ |
Name | Maroto Illera, Reyes |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Comercio y Turismo |
Position | Ex Ministra de Industria, Comercio y Turismo |
Date of cessation | 27/03/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2023 |
End date of perception* | 16/06/2023 |
Monthly Perception | 5294,34€ |
Total perceived* | 13412,33€ |
Page 1 of 9
* For the cases of ending of the presentation