73 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
De La Serna Hernáiz, Iñigo Joaquín | Ministerio de Fomento | Ex MInistro de Fomento | 01/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 01/10/2018 | 4773,51€ | 14479,65€ |
Guindos Jurado, Luis De | Ministerio de Economía, Industria y Competitividad | Ex Ministro de Economía, Industria y Competitividad | 07/03/2018 | 01/04/2018 | 01/06/2018 | 4691,23€ | 9382,46€ |
Zenarrutzabeitia Beldarrain, Miren Idoia | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera CNMC | 23/09/2017 | 01/10/2017 | 30/09/2019 | 7195,74€ | 0,00€ |
Torremocha García-Saenz, Fernando | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero CNMC | 23/09/2017 | 01/10/2017 | 30/09/2019 | 7195,74€ | 0,00€ |
Garcia Matilla, Eduardo | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero CNMC | 30/06/2017 | 01/07/2017 | 30/06/2019 | 7195,74€ | 0,00€ |
Argüelles Salaverría, Pedro | Ministerio de Defensa | Ex Secretario de Estado de Defensa | 19/11/2016 | 02/12/2016 | 17/02/2017 | 6438,38€ | 16391,98€ |
Cardenal Carro, Miguel | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 19/11/2016 | 02/12/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 6438,38€ | 57499,17€ |
Beteta Barreda, Antonio Germán | Ministerio de Hacienda y Administraciones Publicas | Ex Secretario de Estado de Administraciones Públicas | 18/11/2016 | 01/12/2016 | 30/11/2018 | 6438,38€ | 154629,62€ |
Calvo-Sotelo Ibáñez-Martín, Víctor | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Secretario de Estado de Telecomunicaciones y para la Sociedad de la Información | 18/11/2016 | 01/12/2016 | 01/11/2018 | 6438,38€ | 154629,62€ |
Morenés Eulate, Pedro | Ministerio de Defensa | Ex Ministro de Defensa | 04/11/2016 | 02/12/2016 | 25/03/2017 | 4644,78€ | 17530,30€ |
Name | De La Serna Hernáiz, Iñigo Joaquín |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Fomento |
Position | Ex MInistro de Fomento |
Date of cessation | 01/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 01/10/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 4773,51€ |
Total perceived* | 14479,65€ |
Name | Guindos Jurado, Luis De |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía, Industria y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Ministro de Economía, Industria y Competitividad |
Date of cessation | 07/03/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2018 |
End date of perception* | 01/06/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 4691,23€ |
Total perceived* | 9382,46€ |
Name | Zenarrutzabeitia Beldarrain, Miren Idoia |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera CNMC |
Date of cessation | 23/09/2017 |
Start date of perception | 01/10/2017 |
End date of perception* | 30/09/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 7195,74€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Torremocha García-Saenz, Fernando |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero CNMC |
Date of cessation | 23/09/2017 |
Start date of perception | 01/10/2017 |
End date of perception* | 30/09/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 7195,74€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Garcia Matilla, Eduardo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero CNMC |
Date of cessation | 30/06/2017 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2017 |
End date of perception* | 30/06/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 7195,74€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Argüelles Salaverría, Pedro |
Ministry | Ministerio de Defensa |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Defensa |
Date of cessation | 19/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 02/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 17/02/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 16391,98€ |
Name | Cardenal Carro, Miguel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 19/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 02/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 31/08/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 57499,17€ |
Name | Beteta Barreda, Antonio Germán |
Ministry | Ministerio de Hacienda y Administraciones Publicas |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Administraciones Públicas |
Date of cessation | 18/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 01/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 30/11/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 154629,62€ |
Name | Calvo-Sotelo Ibáñez-Martín, Víctor |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Telecomunicaciones y para la Sociedad de la Información |
Date of cessation | 18/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 01/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 154629,62€ |
Name | Morenés Eulate, Pedro |
Ministry | Ministerio de Defensa |
Position | Ex Ministro de Defensa |
Date of cessation | 04/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 02/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 25/03/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 4644,78€ |
Total perceived* | 17530,30€ |
Page 5 of 8
* For the cases of ending of the presentation