23 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Gonzalez Lopez, Maria Jesus | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional de la Competencia | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7053,95€ | 169294,80€ |
Gonzalez Rodriguez, Jose Pascual | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 8016,29€ | 192390,96€ |
Costas Comesaña, Julio | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7053,95€ | 169294,80€ |
Coderch Y Collell, Marcel | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Vicepresidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 8932,04€ | 214368,96€ |
Etxegoyen Gaztelumendi, Elena | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 4693,13€ | 112635,12€ |
Pedroche Y Rojo, Luis | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Consejero de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 01/05/2014 | 02/05/2014 | 01/05/2016 | 8640,32€ | 207713,32€ |
Centeno Huerta, Lourdes | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 05/10/2016 | 06/10/2016 | 19/02/2017 | 0,00€ | 45245,39€ |
Rodriguez Herrer, María Elvira | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 05/10/2016 | 06/10/2016 | 27/02/2017 | 0,00€ | 48118,83€ |
Garcia Matilla, Eduardo | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero CNMC | 30/06/2017 | 01/07/2017 | 30/06/2019 | 7195,74€ | 0,00€ |
Zenarrutzabeitia Beldarrain, Miren Idoia | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera CNMC | 23/09/2017 | 01/10/2017 | 30/09/2019 | 7195,74€ | 0,00€ |
Name | Gonzalez Lopez, Maria Jesus |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional de la Competencia |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7053,95€ |
Total perceived* | 169294,80€ |
Name | Gonzalez Rodriguez, Jose Pascual |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 8016,29€ |
Total perceived* | 192390,96€ |
Name | Costas Comesaña, Julio |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7053,95€ |
Total perceived* | 169294,80€ |
Name | Coderch Y Collell, Marcel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Vicepresidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 8932,04€ |
Total perceived* | 214368,96€ |
Name | Etxegoyen Gaztelumendi, Elena |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4693,13€ |
Total perceived* | 112635,12€ |
Name | Pedroche Y Rojo, Luis |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Consejero de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 01/05/2014 |
Start date of perception | 02/05/2014 |
End date of perception* | 01/05/2016 |
Monthly Perception | 8640,32€ |
Total perceived* | 207713,32€ |
Name | Centeno Huerta, Lourdes |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 05/10/2016 |
Start date of perception | 06/10/2016 |
End date of perception* | 19/02/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 0,00€ |
Total perceived* | 45245,39€ |
Name | Rodriguez Herrer, María Elvira |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 05/10/2016 |
Start date of perception | 06/10/2016 |
End date of perception* | 27/02/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 0,00€ |
Total perceived* | 48118,83€ |
Name | Garcia Matilla, Eduardo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero CNMC |
Date of cessation | 30/06/2017 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2017 |
End date of perception* | 30/06/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 7195,74€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Zenarrutzabeitia Beldarrain, Miren Idoia |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera CNMC |
Date of cessation | 23/09/2017 |
Start date of perception | 01/10/2017 |
End date of perception* | 30/09/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 7195,74€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Page 2 of 3
* For the cases of ending of the presentation