9 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Wert Ortega, José Ignacio | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Ministro de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | 26/06/2015 | 02/07/2015 | 01/08/2015 | 4598,79€ | 4598,79€ |
Cardenal Carro, Miguel | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 19/11/2016 | 02/12/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 6438,38€ | 57499,17€ |
Lete Lasa, José Ramón | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 22/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 12/12/2018 | 6549,33€ | 35366,38€ |
Benzo Sáinz, Fernando | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Secretario de Estado de Cultura | 22/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 02/07/2019 | 6131,58€ | 79710,57€ |
Marín Hellín, Marcial | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Secretario de Estado de Educación, F.P. y Universidades | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 06/06/2020 | 6848,98€ | 157183,90€ |
Rienda Contreras, Mª José | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 29/01/2020 | 01/02/2020 | 21/02/2020 | 5907,76€ | 5907,76€ |
Guirao Cabrera, José | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Ministro de Cultura y Deporte | 12/01/2020 | 01/02/2020 | 01/06/2020 | 4990,54€ | 19962,16€ |
Lozano Domingo, Irene | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 30/03/2021 | 01/04/2021 | 07/06/2021 | 6910,89€ | 15434,32€ |
Franco Pardo, José Manuel | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 13/06/2023 | 01/07/2023 | 22/07/2023 | 7306,02€ | 5357,75€ |
Name | Wert Ortega, José Ignacio |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Ministro de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Date of cessation | 26/06/2015 |
Start date of perception | 02/07/2015 |
End date of perception* | 01/08/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4598,79€ |
Total perceived* | 4598,79€ |
Name | Cardenal Carro, Miguel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 19/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 02/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 31/08/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 57499,17€ |
Name | Lete Lasa, José Ramón |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 22/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 12/12/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6549,33€ |
Total perceived* | 35366,38€ |
Name | Benzo Sáinz, Fernando |
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Cultura |
Date of cessation | 22/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 02/07/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6131,58€ |
Total perceived* | 79710,57€ |
Name | Marín Hellín, Marcial |
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Educación, F.P. y Universidades |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 06/06/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6848,98€ |
Total perceived* | 157183,90€ |
Name | Rienda Contreras, Mª José |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 29/01/2020 |
Start date of perception | 01/02/2020 |
End date of perception* | 21/02/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 5907,76€ |
Total perceived* | 5907,76€ |
Name | Guirao Cabrera, José |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Ministro de Cultura y Deporte |
Date of cessation | 12/01/2020 |
Start date of perception | 01/02/2020 |
End date of perception* | 01/06/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 4990,54€ |
Total perceived* | 19962,16€ |
Name | Lozano Domingo, Irene |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 30/03/2021 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2021 |
End date of perception* | 07/06/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 15434,32€ |
Name | Franco Pardo, José Manuel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 13/06/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2023 |
End date of perception* | 22/07/2023 |
Monthly Perception | 7306,02€ |
Total perceived* | 5357,75€ |
Page 1 of 1
1
* For the cases of ending of the presentation