2 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Serena Sender, Josep María | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico | Ex Presidente del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 01/03/2022 | 01/04/2022 | 31/03/2024 | 7311,78€ | 181958,40€ |
Rodríguez Martí, Manuel | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico | Ex Secretario General del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 24/05/2022 | 01/06/2022 | 31/05/2024 | 6600,63€ | 164729,87€ |
Name | Serena Sender, Josep María |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico |
Position | Ex Presidente del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 01/03/2022 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2022 |
End date of perception* | 31/03/2024 |
Monthly Perception | 7311,78€ |
Total perceived* | 181958,40€ |
Name | Rodríguez Martí, Manuel |
Ministry | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico |
Position | Ex Secretario General del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 24/05/2022 |
Start date of perception | 01/06/2022 |
End date of perception* | 31/05/2024 |
Monthly Perception | 6600,63€ |
Total perceived* | 164729,87€ |
Page 1 of 1
1
* For the cases of ending of the presentation