66 Search results
Name | Senior | Ministry | Date of cessation | Company / Authorized activity | Date of authorization |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Senior | Ministry | Date of cessation | Company / Authorized activity | Date of authorization |
GARCIA-BERDOY CEREZO, JUAN PABLO | EMBAJADOR REPRESENTANTA PERMANENTE ANTE LA UNION EUROPEA | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION | 21/07/2022 | AMERICAN UNIVERSITY | 07/02/2022 |
AZNAR CANO, ISMAEL | D. GRAL. DE CALIDAD Y EVALUACION AMBIENTAL | TRANSICION ECOLOGICA Y EL RETO DEMOGRAFICO | 28/06/2022 | LANDWELL PRICEWATERHOUSE COOPERS TAX & LEGAL SERVICES, S.L, | 04/07/2022 |
TORRES RIESCO, JAVIER | PRESIDENTE EJECUTIVO SAREB | ASUNTOS ECONOMICOS Y TRANSFORMACION DIGITAL | 30/06/2022 | DESPACHO DE ABOGADOS VIEIRA DE ALMEIDA | 08/07/2022 |
GARCIA-BERDOY CEREZO, JUAN PABLO | EMBAJADOR REPRESENTANTE PERMANENTE ANTE LA UNION EUROPEA | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION | 21/07/2022 | LLORENTE Y CUENCA MADRID, S.L. | 07/09/2022 |
LACRUZ GIMENO, PATRICIA | D. GRAL. DE CARTERA COMUN DE SERVICIOS DEL SISTEMA NACIONAL DE SALUD Y FARMACIA | SANIDAD | 31/08/2022 | REINCORPORACION A ESPECIALIZADA Y PRIMARIA LA HORTA MANISES S.A.U. | 30/09/2022 |
RODRIGUEZ MARIN, MARIA DELIA | DIRECTORA DEL DEPARTAMENTO DIGITAL | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO | 21/09/2022 | LA VANGUARDIA EDICIONES SLU | 30/09/2022 |
RODRIGUEZ MARIN, MARIA DELIA | DIRECTORA DEL DEPARTAMENTO DIGITAL | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO | 21/09/2022 | GODO VERTICAL MEDIA, SL | 30/09/2022 |
ANTOLIN LLORENTE, ION FERNANDO | DIRECTOR DEL DEPARTAMENTO DE COORDINACION INFORMATIVA | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO | 02/08/2022 | DIRECTOR DE COMUNICACION DEL PSOE | 27/10/2022 |
RODRIGUEZ GARCIA, JOSE | JEFE DE LA FUERZA TERRESTRE | DEFENSA | 19/10/2022 | HEYMORICH, S.L. | 09/01/2023 |
SOLER SICILIA, ALBERT | D. GRAL. DEPORTES | CULTURA Y DEPORTE | 11/01/2023 | ACENTO PUBLIC AFFAIRS | 13/01/2023 |
Name | GARCIA-BERDOY CEREZO, JUAN PABLO |
---|---|
Senior | EMBAJADOR REPRESENTANTA PERMANENTE ANTE LA UNION EUROPEA |
Ministry | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION |
Date of cessation | 21/07/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | AMERICAN UNIVERSITY |
Date of authorization | 07/02/2022 |
Name | AZNAR CANO, ISMAEL |
Senior | D. GRAL. DE CALIDAD Y EVALUACION AMBIENTAL |
Ministry | TRANSICION ECOLOGICA Y EL RETO DEMOGRAFICO |
Date of cessation | 28/06/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | LANDWELL PRICEWATERHOUSE COOPERS TAX & LEGAL SERVICES, S.L, |
Date of authorization | 04/07/2022 |
Name | TORRES RIESCO, JAVIER |
Senior | PRESIDENTE EJECUTIVO SAREB |
Ministry | ASUNTOS ECONOMICOS Y TRANSFORMACION DIGITAL |
Date of cessation | 30/06/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | DESPACHO DE ABOGADOS VIEIRA DE ALMEIDA |
Date of authorization | 08/07/2022 |
Name | GARCIA-BERDOY CEREZO, JUAN PABLO |
Senior | EMBAJADOR REPRESENTANTE PERMANENTE ANTE LA UNION EUROPEA |
Ministry | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION |
Date of cessation | 21/07/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | LLORENTE Y CUENCA MADRID, S.L. |
Date of authorization | 07/09/2022 |
Name | LACRUZ GIMENO, PATRICIA |
Senior | D. GRAL. DE CARTERA COMUN DE SERVICIOS DEL SISTEMA NACIONAL DE SALUD Y FARMACIA |
Ministry | SANIDAD |
Date of cessation | 31/08/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | REINCORPORACION A ESPECIALIZADA Y PRIMARIA LA HORTA MANISES S.A.U. |
Date of authorization | 30/09/2022 |
Name | RODRIGUEZ MARIN, MARIA DELIA |
Senior | DIRECTORA DEL DEPARTAMENTO DIGITAL |
Ministry | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO |
Date of cessation | 21/09/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | LA VANGUARDIA EDICIONES SLU |
Date of authorization | 30/09/2022 |
Name | RODRIGUEZ MARIN, MARIA DELIA |
Senior | DIRECTORA DEL DEPARTAMENTO DIGITAL |
Ministry | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO |
Date of cessation | 21/09/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | GODO VERTICAL MEDIA, SL |
Date of authorization | 30/09/2022 |
Name | ANTOLIN LLORENTE, ION FERNANDO |
Senior | DIRECTOR DEL DEPARTAMENTO DE COORDINACION INFORMATIVA |
Ministry | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO |
Date of cessation | 02/08/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | DIRECTOR DE COMUNICACION DEL PSOE |
Date of authorization | 27/10/2022 |
Name | RODRIGUEZ GARCIA, JOSE |
Senior | JEFE DE LA FUERZA TERRESTRE |
Ministry | DEFENSA |
Date of cessation | 19/10/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | HEYMORICH, S.L. |
Date of authorization | 09/01/2023 |
Name | SOLER SICILIA, ALBERT |
Senior | D. GRAL. DEPORTES |
Ministry | CULTURA Y DEPORTE |
Date of cessation | 11/01/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | ACENTO PUBLIC AFFAIRS |
Date of authorization | 13/01/2023 |
Page 1 of 7