89 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Morenés Eulate, Pedro | Ministerio de Defensa | Ex Ministro de Defensa | 04/11/2016 | 02/12/2016 | 25/03/2017 | 4644,78€ | 17530,30€ |
Argüelles Salaverría, Pedro | Ministerio de Defensa | Ex Secretario de Estado de Defensa | 19/11/2016 | 02/12/2016 | 17/02/2017 | 6438,38€ | 16391,98€ |
Lozano Domingo, Irene | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 30/03/2021 | 01/04/2021 | 07/06/2021 | 6910,89€ | 15434,32€ |
Jalloul Muro, Hana | Ministerio de Inclusión, Seguridad Social y Migraciones | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Migraciones | 30/03/2021 | 01/04/2021 | 07/06/2021 | 6910,89€ | 15434,32€ |
Montón Giménez, Carmen | Ministerio de Sanidad, Consumo y Bienestar Social | Ex Ministra de Sanidad, Consumo y Bienestar Social | 11/09/2018 | 01/10/2018 | 05/01/2019 | 4773,51€ | 15116,12€ |
De La Serna Hernáiz, Iñigo Joaquín | Ministerio de Fomento | Ex MInistro de Fomento | 01/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 01/10/2018 | 4773,51€ | 14479,65€ |
Maroto Illera, Reyes | Ministerio de Industria, Comercio y Turismo | Ex Ministra de Industria, Comercio y Turismo | 27/03/2023 | 01/04/2023 | 16/06/2023 | 5294,34€ | 13412,33€ |
Vela Olmo, Carmen | Ministerio de Economía, Industria y Competitividad | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Investigación, Desarrollo e Innovación | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 31/08/2018 | 6549,33€ | 13098,66€ |
Jimenez Latorre, Fernando | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Secretario de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa | 30/08/2014 | 02/09/2014 | 01/11/2014 | 6311,40€ | 12622,80€ |
Cueva Fernández, Ana De La | Ministerio de Asuntos Económicos y Transformación Digital | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa | 11/05/2021 | 01/06/2021 | 19/07/2021 | 6910,89€ | 11287,79€ |
Name | Morenés Eulate, Pedro |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Defensa |
Position | Ex Ministro de Defensa |
Date of cessation | 04/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 02/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 25/03/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 4644,78€ |
Total perceived* | 17530,30€ |
Name | Argüelles Salaverría, Pedro |
Ministry | Ministerio de Defensa |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Defensa |
Date of cessation | 19/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 02/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 17/02/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 16391,98€ |
Name | Lozano Domingo, Irene |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 30/03/2021 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2021 |
End date of perception* | 07/06/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 15434,32€ |
Name | Jalloul Muro, Hana |
Ministry | Ministerio de Inclusión, Seguridad Social y Migraciones |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Migraciones |
Date of cessation | 30/03/2021 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2021 |
End date of perception* | 07/06/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 15434,32€ |
Name | Montón Giménez, Carmen |
Ministry | Ministerio de Sanidad, Consumo y Bienestar Social |
Position | Ex Ministra de Sanidad, Consumo y Bienestar Social |
Date of cessation | 11/09/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/10/2018 |
End date of perception* | 05/01/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 4773,51€ |
Total perceived* | 15116,12€ |
Name | De La Serna Hernáiz, Iñigo Joaquín |
Ministry | Ministerio de Fomento |
Position | Ex MInistro de Fomento |
Date of cessation | 01/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 01/10/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 4773,51€ |
Total perceived* | 14479,65€ |
Name | Maroto Illera, Reyes |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Comercio y Turismo |
Position | Ex Ministra de Industria, Comercio y Turismo |
Date of cessation | 27/03/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2023 |
End date of perception* | 16/06/2023 |
Monthly Perception | 5294,34€ |
Total perceived* | 13412,33€ |
Name | Vela Olmo, Carmen |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía, Industria y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Investigación, Desarrollo e Innovación |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 31/08/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6549,33€ |
Total perceived* | 13098,66€ |
Name | Jimenez Latorre, Fernando |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa |
Date of cessation | 30/08/2014 |
Start date of perception | 02/09/2014 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2014 |
Monthly Perception | 6311,40€ |
Total perceived* | 12622,80€ |
Name | Cueva Fernández, Ana De La |
Ministry | Ministerio de Asuntos Económicos y Transformación Digital |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa |
Date of cessation | 11/05/2021 |
Start date of perception | 01/06/2021 |
End date of perception* | 19/07/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 11287,79€ |
Page 7 of 9
Previous 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 Next
* For the cases of ending of the presentation