89 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
García Rodríguez, María | Ministerio de Agricultura, Pesca y Alimentación | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Medio Ambiente | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 26/12/2019 | 6601,84€ | 118833,16€ |
Companys Sanfeliu, Ramon | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 4693,13€ | 112635,12€ |
Varela Flores, Manuel Guillermo | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 4693,13€ | 112635,12€ |
Etxegoyen Gaztelumendi, Elena | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 4693,13€ | 112635,12€ |
Lassalle Ruiz, José María | Ministerio de Energía, Turismo y Agenda Digital | Ex Secretario de Estado para la Socied.de la Inform.y Ag. Digital | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 6671,31€ | 93398,36€ |
Fabra Utray, Jorge | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 02/02/2019 | 01/03/2019 | 23/04/2020 | 6631,16€ | 91947,75€ |
Pardo de Vera Posada, Isabel | Ministerio de Transportes, Movilidad y Agenda Urbana | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Transportes, Movilidad y Agenda Urbana | 21/02/2023 | 01/03/2023 | 31/01/2024 | 7333,19€ | 80393,38€ |
Benzo Sáinz, Fernando | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Secretario de Estado de Cultura | 22/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 02/07/2019 | 6131,58€ | 79710,57€ |
Burgos Gallego, Tomás | Ministerio de Empleo y Seguridad Social | Ex Secretario de la Seguridad Social | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 17/06/2019 | 6363,42€ | 76361,04€ |
Sanz Roldán, Félix | Ministerio de la Presidencia | Ex Secretario de Estado Director del Centro Nacional de Inteligencia | 05/07/2019 | 01/08/2019 | 09/07/2020 | 6848,98€ | 76160,96€ |
Name | García Rodríguez, María |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Agricultura, Pesca y Alimentación |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Medio Ambiente |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 26/12/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6601,84€ |
Total perceived* | 118833,16€ |
Name | Companys Sanfeliu, Ramon |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4693,13€ |
Total perceived* | 112635,12€ |
Name | Varela Flores, Manuel Guillermo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4693,13€ |
Total perceived* | 112635,12€ |
Name | Etxegoyen Gaztelumendi, Elena |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4693,13€ |
Total perceived* | 112635,12€ |
Name | Lassalle Ruiz, José María |
Ministry | Ministerio de Energía, Turismo y Agenda Digital |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado para la Socied.de la Inform.y Ag. Digital |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 31/08/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6671,31€ |
Total perceived* | 93398,36€ |
Name | Fabra Utray, Jorge |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 02/02/2019 |
Start date of perception | 01/03/2019 |
End date of perception* | 23/04/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6631,16€ |
Total perceived* | 91947,75€ |
Name | Pardo de Vera Posada, Isabel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Transportes, Movilidad y Agenda Urbana |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Transportes, Movilidad y Agenda Urbana |
Date of cessation | 21/02/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/03/2023 |
End date of perception* | 31/01/2024 |
Monthly Perception | 7333,19€ |
Total perceived* | 80393,38€ |
Name | Benzo Sáinz, Fernando |
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Cultura |
Date of cessation | 22/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 02/07/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6131,58€ |
Total perceived* | 79710,57€ |
Name | Burgos Gallego, Tomás |
Ministry | Ministerio de Empleo y Seguridad Social |
Position | Ex Secretario de la Seguridad Social |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 17/06/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6363,42€ |
Total perceived* | 76361,04€ |
Name | Sanz Roldán, Félix |
Ministry | Ministerio de la Presidencia |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado Director del Centro Nacional de Inteligencia |
Date of cessation | 05/07/2019 |
Start date of perception | 01/08/2019 |
End date of perception* | 09/07/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6848,98€ |
Total perceived* | 76160,96€ |
Page 4 of 9
Previous 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 Next
* For the cases of ending of the presentation