11 Search results under the term "nuclear"
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Soria López, José Manuel | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Ministro de Industria, Energía y Turismo | 16/04/2016 | 02/05/2016 | 01/02/2017 | 4644,70€ | 41803,02€ |
Gurguí Ferrer, Antoni | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 19/10/2015 | 01/01/2015 | 30/10/2017 | 6247,73€ | 151969,32€ |
Colino Martínez, Antonio | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 29/12/2012 | 02/01/2013 | 04/12/2014 | 6247,73€ | 149945,50€ |
Calvo-Sotelo Ibáñez-Martín, Víctor | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Secretario de Estado de Telecomunicaciones y para la Sociedad de la Información | 18/11/2016 | 01/12/2016 | 01/11/2018 | 6438,38€ | 154629,62€ |
Martínez Ten, Carmen | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Presidenta del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 29/12/2012 | 02/01/2013 | 01/01/2015 | 6546,82€ | 157123,60€ |
Rodríguez Martí, Manuel | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico | Ex Secretario General del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 24/05/2022 | 01/06/2022 | 31/05/2024 | 6600,63€ | 164729,87€ |
Castelló Boronat, Fernando | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 31/03/2019 | 01/04/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 6631,16€ | 161481,96€ |
Velasco García, Rosario | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Consejera del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 31/03/2019 | 01/04/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 6631,16€ | 191481,96€ |
Fabra Utray, Jorge | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 02/02/2019 | 01/03/2019 | 23/04/2020 | 6631,16€ | 91947,75€ |
Marti Scharfhausen, Luis Fernando | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Presidente del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 31/03/2019 | 01/04/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 6948,18€ | 196202,49€ |
Name | Soria López, José Manuel |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Ministro de Industria, Energía y Turismo |
Date of cessation | 16/04/2016 |
Start date of perception | 02/05/2016 |
End date of perception* | 01/02/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 4644,70€ |
Total perceived* | 41803,02€ |
Name | Gurguí Ferrer, Antoni |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 19/10/2015 |
Start date of perception | 01/01/2015 |
End date of perception* | 30/10/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 6247,73€ |
Total perceived* | 151969,32€ |
Name | Colino Martínez, Antonio |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 29/12/2012 |
Start date of perception | 02/01/2013 |
End date of perception* | 04/12/2014 |
Monthly Perception | 6247,73€ |
Total perceived* | 149945,50€ |
Name | Calvo-Sotelo Ibáñez-Martín, Víctor |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Telecomunicaciones y para la Sociedad de la Información |
Date of cessation | 18/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 01/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 154629,62€ |
Name | Martínez Ten, Carmen |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Presidenta del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 29/12/2012 |
Start date of perception | 02/01/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/01/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 6546,82€ |
Total perceived* | 157123,60€ |
Name | Rodríguez Martí, Manuel |
Ministry | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico |
Position | Ex Secretario General del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 24/05/2022 |
Start date of perception | 01/06/2022 |
End date of perception* | 31/05/2024 |
Monthly Perception | 6600,63€ |
Total perceived* | 164729,87€ |
Name | Castelló Boronat, Fernando |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 31/03/2019 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2019 |
End date of perception* | 31/03/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6631,16€ |
Total perceived* | 161481,96€ |
Name | Velasco García, Rosario |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Consejera del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 31/03/2019 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2019 |
End date of perception* | 31/03/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6631,16€ |
Total perceived* | 191481,96€ |
Name | Fabra Utray, Jorge |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 02/02/2019 |
Start date of perception | 01/03/2019 |
End date of perception* | 23/04/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6631,16€ |
Total perceived* | 91947,75€ |
Name | Marti Scharfhausen, Luis Fernando |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Presidente del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 31/03/2019 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2019 |
End date of perception* | 31/03/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6948,18€ |
Total perceived* | 196202,49€ |
Page 1 of 2
* For the cases of ending of the presentation