89 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Rodríguez Martí, Manuel | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico | Ex Secretario General del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 24/05/2022 | 01/06/2022 | 31/05/2024 | 6600,63€ | 164729,87€ |
García Rodríguez, María | Ministerio de Agricultura, Pesca y Alimentación | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Medio Ambiente | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 26/12/2019 | 6601,84€ | 118833,16€ |
Castelló Boronat, Fernando | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 31/03/2019 | 01/04/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 6631,16€ | 161481,96€ |
Velasco García, Rosario | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Consejera del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 31/03/2019 | 01/04/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 6631,16€ | 191481,96€ |
Fabra Utray, Jorge | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 02/02/2019 | 01/03/2019 | 23/04/2020 | 6631,16€ | 91947,75€ |
Lassalle Ruiz, José María | Ministerio de Energía, Turismo y Agenda Digital | Ex Secretario de Estado para la Socied.de la Inform.y Ag. Digital | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 6671,31€ | 93398,36€ |
Marín Hellín, Marcial | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Secretario de Estado de Educación, F.P. y Universidades | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 06/06/2020 | 6848,98€ | 157183,90€ |
Sanz Roldán, Félix | Ministerio de la Presidencia | Ex Secretario de Estado Director del Centro Nacional de Inteligencia | 05/07/2019 | 01/08/2019 | 09/07/2020 | 6848,98€ | 76160,96€ |
Mártinez Castro, Carmen | Presidencia del Gobierno | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Comunicación | 08/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 30/06/2020 | 6848,98€ | 160756,60€ |
Lozano Domingo, Irene | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 30/03/2021 | 01/04/2021 | 07/06/2021 | 6910,89€ | 15434,32€ |
Name | Rodríguez Martí, Manuel |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio para la Transición Ecológica y el Reto Demográfico |
Position | Ex Secretario General del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 24/05/2022 |
Start date of perception | 01/06/2022 |
End date of perception* | 31/05/2024 |
Monthly Perception | 6600,63€ |
Total perceived* | 164729,87€ |
Name | García Rodríguez, María |
Ministry | Ministerio de Agricultura, Pesca y Alimentación |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Medio Ambiente |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 26/12/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6601,84€ |
Total perceived* | 118833,16€ |
Name | Castelló Boronat, Fernando |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 31/03/2019 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2019 |
End date of perception* | 31/03/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6631,16€ |
Total perceived* | 161481,96€ |
Name | Velasco García, Rosario |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Consejera del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 31/03/2019 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2019 |
End date of perception* | 31/03/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6631,16€ |
Total perceived* | 191481,96€ |
Name | Fabra Utray, Jorge |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 02/02/2019 |
Start date of perception | 01/03/2019 |
End date of perception* | 23/04/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6631,16€ |
Total perceived* | 91947,75€ |
Name | Lassalle Ruiz, José María |
Ministry | Ministerio de Energía, Turismo y Agenda Digital |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado para la Socied.de la Inform.y Ag. Digital |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 31/08/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6671,31€ |
Total perceived* | 93398,36€ |
Name | Marín Hellín, Marcial |
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Educación, F.P. y Universidades |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 06/06/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6848,98€ |
Total perceived* | 157183,90€ |
Name | Sanz Roldán, Félix |
Ministry | Ministerio de la Presidencia |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado Director del Centro Nacional de Inteligencia |
Date of cessation | 05/07/2019 |
Start date of perception | 01/08/2019 |
End date of perception* | 09/07/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6848,98€ |
Total perceived* | 76160,96€ |
Name | Mártinez Castro, Carmen |
Ministry | Presidencia del Gobierno |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Comunicación |
Date of cessation | 08/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 30/06/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6848,98€ |
Total perceived* | 160756,60€ |
Name | Lozano Domingo, Irene |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 30/03/2021 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2021 |
End date of perception* | 07/06/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 15434,32€ |
Page 5 of 9
Previous 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 Next
* For the cases of ending of the presentation