73 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Albella Amigo, Sebastian | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 15/12/2020 | 16/12/2020 | 10803,09€ | 0,00€ | |
Martinez-Pina Garcia, Ana M. | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 15/12/2020 | 16/12/2020 | 10802,93€ | 0,00€ | |
Alfonsín Alfonso, Jaime Luis | Casa S.M. el Rey | Ex Jefe de la Casa de S.M. El Rey | 16/02/2024 | 01/03/2024 | 28/02/2026 | 10074,80€ | 0,00€ |
Segura Sánchez, Julio | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 08/10/2012 | 08/10/2012 | 07/10/2014 | 9955,13€ | 236789,88€ |
Lorenzo Almendros, Bernardo | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Presidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 9389,94€ | 225358,56€ |
Coderch Y Collell, Marcel | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Vicepresidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 8932,04€ | 214368,96€ |
Lafuente Felez, Alberto | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Presidente Comisión Nacional de la Energía | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 08/10/2015 | 8762,54€ | 203585,34€ |
Pedroche Y Rojo, Luis | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Consejero de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 01/05/2014 | 02/05/2014 | 01/05/2016 | 8640,32€ | 207713,32€ |
Plana Dropez, Marta | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera de la Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 06/07/2013 | 02/08/2013 | 01/08/2015 | 8016,29€ | 192390,96€ |
Gonzalez Rodriguez, Jose Pascual | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 8016,29€ | 192390,96€ |
Name | Albella Amigo, Sebastian |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 15/12/2020 |
Start date of perception | 16/12/2020 |
End date of perception* | |
Monthly Perception | 10803,09€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Martinez-Pina Garcia, Ana M. |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 15/12/2020 |
Start date of perception | 16/12/2020 |
End date of perception* | |
Monthly Perception | 10802,93€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Alfonsín Alfonso, Jaime Luis |
Ministry | Casa S.M. el Rey |
Position | Ex Jefe de la Casa de S.M. El Rey |
Date of cessation | 16/02/2024 |
Start date of perception | 01/03/2024 |
End date of perception* | 28/02/2026 |
Monthly Perception | 10074,80€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Segura Sánchez, Julio |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2012 |
Start date of perception | 08/10/2012 |
End date of perception* | 07/10/2014 |
Monthly Perception | 9955,13€ |
Total perceived* | 236789,88€ |
Name | Lorenzo Almendros, Bernardo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Presidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 9389,94€ |
Total perceived* | 225358,56€ |
Name | Coderch Y Collell, Marcel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Vicepresidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 8932,04€ |
Total perceived* | 214368,96€ |
Name | Lafuente Felez, Alberto |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Presidente Comisión Nacional de la Energía |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 08/10/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 8762,54€ |
Total perceived* | 203585,34€ |
Name | Pedroche Y Rojo, Luis |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Consejero de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 01/05/2014 |
Start date of perception | 02/05/2014 |
End date of perception* | 01/05/2016 |
Monthly Perception | 8640,32€ |
Total perceived* | 207713,32€ |
Name | Plana Dropez, Marta |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera de la Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 06/07/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/08/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/08/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 8016,29€ |
Total perceived* | 192390,96€ |
Name | Gonzalez Rodriguez, Jose Pascual |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 8016,29€ |
Total perceived* | 192390,96€ |
Page 1 of 8
* For the cases of ending of the presentation