73 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Albella Amigo, Sebastian | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 15/12/2020 | 16/12/2020 | 10803,09€ | 0,00€ | |
Martinez-Pina Garcia, Ana M. | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 15/12/2020 | 16/12/2020 | 10802,93€ | 0,00€ | |
Aguirano Nalda, Luis Marcos | Ministerio de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación | Ex Secretario de Estado para la U.E. | 04/02/2020 | 01/03/2020 | 13/10/2021 | 6910,89€ | 133667,69€ |
Valenzuela Marzo, Fernando Martín | Ministerio de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación | Ex Secretario de Estado de Asuntos Exteriores, U.E. y Cooperación | 04/02/2020 | 01/03/2020 | 17/10/2021 | 6910,89€ | 134589,14€ |
De La Iglesia Y González De Peredo, Juan Pablo | Ministerio de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación | Ex Secretario de Estado de Cooperación Internacional y para Iberoamérica y el Caribe | 04/02/2020 | 01/03/2020 | 13/10/2021 | 6910,89€ | 133667,69€ |
Rienda Contreras, Mª José | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 29/01/2020 | 01/02/2020 | 21/02/2020 | 5907,76€ | 5907,76€ |
Granado Martínez, Octavio José | Ministerio de Trabajo, Migraciones y Seguridad Social | Ex Secretario de Estado de la Seguridad Social | 14/01/2020 | 01/02/2020 | 27/08/2021 | 6910,89€ | 129887,62€ |
Rumi Ibañez, Mª Consuelo | Ministerio de Trabajo, Migraciones y Seguridad Social | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Migraciones | 29/01/2020 | 01/02/2020 | 11/09/2021 | 6910,89€ | 133112,72€ |
Guirao Cabrera, José | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Ministro de Cultura y Deporte | 12/01/2020 | 01/02/2020 | 01/06/2020 | 4990,54€ | 19962,16€ |
Sanz Roldán, Félix | Ministerio de la Presidencia | Ex Secretario de Estado Director del Centro Nacional de Inteligencia | 05/07/2019 | 01/08/2019 | 09/07/2020 | 6848,98€ | 76160,96€ |
Name | Albella Amigo, Sebastian |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 15/12/2020 |
Start date of perception | 16/12/2020 |
End date of perception* | |
Monthly Perception | 10803,09€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Martinez-Pina Garcia, Ana M. |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Vicepresidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 15/12/2020 |
Start date of perception | 16/12/2020 |
End date of perception* | |
Monthly Perception | 10802,93€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Aguirano Nalda, Luis Marcos |
Ministry | Ministerio de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado para la U.E. |
Date of cessation | 04/02/2020 |
Start date of perception | 01/03/2020 |
End date of perception* | 13/10/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 133667,69€ |
Name | Valenzuela Marzo, Fernando Martín |
Ministry | Ministerio de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Asuntos Exteriores, U.E. y Cooperación |
Date of cessation | 04/02/2020 |
Start date of perception | 01/03/2020 |
End date of perception* | 17/10/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 134589,14€ |
Name | De La Iglesia Y González De Peredo, Juan Pablo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Cooperación Internacional y para Iberoamérica y el Caribe |
Date of cessation | 04/02/2020 |
Start date of perception | 01/03/2020 |
End date of perception* | 13/10/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 133667,69€ |
Name | Rienda Contreras, Mª José |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 29/01/2020 |
Start date of perception | 01/02/2020 |
End date of perception* | 21/02/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 5907,76€ |
Total perceived* | 5907,76€ |
Name | Granado Martínez, Octavio José |
Ministry | Ministerio de Trabajo, Migraciones y Seguridad Social |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de la Seguridad Social |
Date of cessation | 14/01/2020 |
Start date of perception | 01/02/2020 |
End date of perception* | 27/08/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 129887,62€ |
Name | Rumi Ibañez, Mª Consuelo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Trabajo, Migraciones y Seguridad Social |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Migraciones |
Date of cessation | 29/01/2020 |
Start date of perception | 01/02/2020 |
End date of perception* | 11/09/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 133112,72€ |
Name | Guirao Cabrera, José |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Ministro de Cultura y Deporte |
Date of cessation | 12/01/2020 |
Start date of perception | 01/02/2020 |
End date of perception* | 01/06/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 4990,54€ |
Total perceived* | 19962,16€ |
Name | Sanz Roldán, Félix |
Ministry | Ministerio de la Presidencia |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado Director del Centro Nacional de Inteligencia |
Date of cessation | 05/07/2019 |
Start date of perception | 01/08/2019 |
End date of perception* | 09/07/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6848,98€ |
Total perceived* | 76160,96€ |
Page 2 of 8
* For the cases of ending of the presentation