73 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Alfonsín Alfonso, Jaime Luis | Casa S.M. el Rey | Ex Jefe de la Casa de S.M. El Rey | 16/02/2024 | 01/03/2024 | 28/02/2026 | 10074,80€ | 0,00€ |
Rodriguez Esquerdo, Antonio Julián | Ministerio de Justicia | Ex Secretario de Estado de Justicia | 28/11/2023 | 01/12/2023 | 21/10/2025 | 7403,12€ | 0,00€ |
Franco Pardo, José Manuel | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 13/06/2023 | 01/07/2023 | 22/07/2023 | 7306,02€ | 5357,75€ |
Maroto Illera, Reyes | Ministerio de Industria, Comercio y Turismo | Ex Ministra de Industria, Comercio y Turismo | 27/03/2023 | 01/04/2023 | 16/06/2023 | 5294,34€ | 13412,33€ |
Esteban López, Paz | Ministerio de Defensa | Ex Secretaria de Estado Directora del CNI | 10/05/2022 | 01/06/2022 | 31/05/2024 | 7403,12€ | 174122,32€ |
Gallach Figueras, Cristina | Ministerio de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Asuntos Exteriores y para Iberoamérica y el Caribe | 20/07/2021 | 01/08/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 7049,12€ | 49122,63€ |
González Laya, María Aránzazu | Ministerio de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación | Ex Ministra de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación | 10/07/2021 | 01/08/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 5090,35€ | 35133,40€ |
Redondo Bacaicoa, Iván | Presidencia del Gobierno | Ex Director del Gabinete de la Presidencia del Gobierno | 13/07/2021 | 01/08/2021 | 07/11/2021 | 6910,89€ | 22345,21€ |
Celaá Diéguez, María Isabel | Ministerio de Educación y Formación Profesional | Ex Ministra de Educación y Formación Profesional | 10/07/2021 | 01/08/2021 | 25/01/2022 | 5090,35€ | 29194,66€ |
Lozano Domingo, Irene | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 30/03/2021 | 01/04/2021 | 07/06/2021 | 6910,89€ | 15434,32€ |
Name | Alfonsín Alfonso, Jaime Luis |
---|---|
Ministry | Casa S.M. el Rey |
Position | Ex Jefe de la Casa de S.M. El Rey |
Date of cessation | 16/02/2024 |
Start date of perception | 01/03/2024 |
End date of perception* | 28/02/2026 |
Monthly Perception | 10074,80€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Rodriguez Esquerdo, Antonio Julián |
Ministry | Ministerio de Justicia |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Justicia |
Date of cessation | 28/11/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/12/2023 |
End date of perception* | 21/10/2025 |
Monthly Perception | 7403,12€ |
Total perceived* | 0,00€ |
Name | Franco Pardo, José Manuel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 13/06/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2023 |
End date of perception* | 22/07/2023 |
Monthly Perception | 7306,02€ |
Total perceived* | 5357,75€ |
Name | Maroto Illera, Reyes |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Comercio y Turismo |
Position | Ex Ministra de Industria, Comercio y Turismo |
Date of cessation | 27/03/2023 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2023 |
End date of perception* | 16/06/2023 |
Monthly Perception | 5294,34€ |
Total perceived* | 13412,33€ |
Name | Esteban López, Paz |
Ministry | Ministerio de Defensa |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado Directora del CNI |
Date of cessation | 10/05/2022 |
Start date of perception | 01/06/2022 |
End date of perception* | 31/05/2024 |
Monthly Perception | 7403,12€ |
Total perceived* | 174122,32€ |
Name | Gallach Figueras, Cristina |
Ministry | Ministerio de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Asuntos Exteriores y para Iberoamérica y el Caribe |
Date of cessation | 20/07/2021 |
Start date of perception | 01/08/2021 |
End date of perception* | 28/02/2022 |
Monthly Perception | 7049,12€ |
Total perceived* | 49122,63€ |
Name | González Laya, María Aránzazu |
Ministry | Ministerio de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación |
Position | Ex Ministra de Asuntos Exteriores, Unión Europea y Cooperación |
Date of cessation | 10/07/2021 |
Start date of perception | 01/08/2021 |
End date of perception* | 28/02/2022 |
Monthly Perception | 5090,35€ |
Total perceived* | 35133,40€ |
Name | Redondo Bacaicoa, Iván |
Ministry | Presidencia del Gobierno |
Position | Ex Director del Gabinete de la Presidencia del Gobierno |
Date of cessation | 13/07/2021 |
Start date of perception | 01/08/2021 |
End date of perception* | 07/11/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 22345,21€ |
Name | Celaá Diéguez, María Isabel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación y Formación Profesional |
Position | Ex Ministra de Educación y Formación Profesional |
Date of cessation | 10/07/2021 |
Start date of perception | 01/08/2021 |
End date of perception* | 25/01/2022 |
Monthly Perception | 5090,35€ |
Total perceived* | 29194,66€ |
Name | Lozano Domingo, Irene |
Ministry | Ministerio de Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidenta del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 30/03/2021 |
Start date of perception | 01/04/2021 |
End date of perception* | 07/06/2021 |
Monthly Perception | 6910,89€ |
Total perceived* | 15434,32€ |
Page 1 of 8
* For the cases of ending of the presentation