73 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Marín Hellín, Marcial | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Secretario de Estado de Educación, F.P. y Universidades | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 06/06/2020 | 6848,98€ | 157183,90€ |
Navia Simón, Daniel | Ministerio de Energía, Turismo y Agenda Digital | Ex Secretario de Estado de Energía | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 01/11/2018 | 6549,33€ | 32746,65€ |
Lassalle Ruiz, José María | Ministerio de Energía, Turismo y Agenda Digital | Ex Secretario de Estado para la Socied.de la Inform.y Ag. Digital | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 6671,31€ | 93398,36€ |
Vela Olmo, Carmen | Ministerio de Economía, Industria y Competitividad | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Investigación, Desarrollo e Innovación | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 31/08/2018 | 6549,33€ | 13098,66€ |
Bermúdez De Castro Mur, Roberto | Ministerio de la Presidencia y para las Administraciones Territoriales | Ex Secretario de Estado para las Administraciones Territoriales | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 15/10/2018 | 6549,33€ | 22922,65€ |
Burgos Gallego, Tomás | Ministerio de Empleo y Seguridad Social | Ex Secretario de la Seguridad Social | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 17/06/2019 | 6363,42€ | 76361,04€ |
Riesgo Figerrola-Ferreti, Juan Pablo | Ministerio de Empleo y Seguridad Social | Ex Secretario de Estado de Empleo | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 07/01/2019 | 5842,80€ | 40899,33€ |
Mártinez Castro, Carmen | Presidencia del Gobierno | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Comunicación | 08/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 30/06/2020 | 6848,98€ | 160756,60€ |
Conde Bajén, Agustín | Ministerio de Defensa | Ex Secretario de Estado de Defensa | 08/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 03/03/2019 | 5969,87€ | 53728,80€ |
Garcés Sanagustín, Mario | Ministerio de Sanidad, Consumo y Bienestar Social | Ex Secretario de Estado de Servicios Sociales e igualdad | 08/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 09/05/2019 | 6258,99€ | 68848,89€ |
Name | Marín Hellín, Marcial |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Educación, F.P. y Universidades |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 06/06/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6848,98€ |
Total perceived* | 157183,90€ |
Name | Navia Simón, Daniel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Energía, Turismo y Agenda Digital |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Energía |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6549,33€ |
Total perceived* | 32746,65€ |
Name | Lassalle Ruiz, José María |
Ministry | Ministerio de Energía, Turismo y Agenda Digital |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado para la Socied.de la Inform.y Ag. Digital |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 31/08/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6671,31€ |
Total perceived* | 93398,36€ |
Name | Vela Olmo, Carmen |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía, Industria y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Investigación, Desarrollo e Innovación |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 31/08/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6549,33€ |
Total perceived* | 13098,66€ |
Name | Bermúdez De Castro Mur, Roberto |
Ministry | Ministerio de la Presidencia y para las Administraciones Territoriales |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado para las Administraciones Territoriales |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 15/10/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6549,33€ |
Total perceived* | 22922,65€ |
Name | Burgos Gallego, Tomás |
Ministry | Ministerio de Empleo y Seguridad Social |
Position | Ex Secretario de la Seguridad Social |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 17/06/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6363,42€ |
Total perceived* | 76361,04€ |
Name | Riesgo Figerrola-Ferreti, Juan Pablo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Empleo y Seguridad Social |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Empleo |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 07/01/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 5842,80€ |
Total perceived* | 40899,33€ |
Name | Mártinez Castro, Carmen |
Ministry | Presidencia del Gobierno |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Comunicación |
Date of cessation | 08/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 30/06/2020 |
Monthly Perception | 6848,98€ |
Total perceived* | 160756,60€ |
Name | Conde Bajén, Agustín |
Ministry | Ministerio de Defensa |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Defensa |
Date of cessation | 08/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 03/03/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 5969,87€ |
Total perceived* | 53728,80€ |
Name | Garcés Sanagustín, Mario |
Ministry | Ministerio de Sanidad, Consumo y Bienestar Social |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Servicios Sociales e igualdad |
Date of cessation | 08/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 09/05/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6258,99€ |
Total perceived* | 68848,89€ |
Page 4 of 8
* For the cases of ending of the presentation