73 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Segura Sánchez, Julio | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores | 08/10/2012 | 08/10/2012 | 07/10/2014 | 9955,13€ | 236789,88€ |
Colino Martínez, Antonio | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 29/12/2012 | 02/01/2013 | 04/12/2014 | 6247,73€ | 149945,50€ |
Martínez Ten, Carmen | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Presidenta del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 29/12/2012 | 02/01/2013 | 01/01/2015 | 6546,82€ | 157123,60€ |
Plana Dropez, Marta | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera de la Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 06/07/2013 | 02/08/2013 | 01/08/2015 | 8016,29€ | 192390,96€ |
Companys Sanfeliu, Ramon | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 4693,13€ | 112635,12€ |
Lorenzo Almendros, Bernardo | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Presidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 9389,94€ | 225358,56€ |
Diez Martin, Luis Miguel | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7053,95€ | 169294,80€ |
Batalla Bejerano, Joan | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Energía | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7814,80€ | 187555,20€ |
Varela Flores, Manuel Guillermo | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 4693,13€ | 112635,12€ |
Gonzalez Lopez, Maria Jesus | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional de la Competencia | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7053,95€ | 169294,80€ |
Name | Segura Sánchez, Julio |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Presidente de la Comisión Nacional del Mercado de Valores |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2012 |
Start date of perception | 08/10/2012 |
End date of perception* | 07/10/2014 |
Monthly Perception | 9955,13€ |
Total perceived* | 236789,88€ |
Name | Colino Martínez, Antonio |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Consejero del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 29/12/2012 |
Start date of perception | 02/01/2013 |
End date of perception* | 04/12/2014 |
Monthly Perception | 6247,73€ |
Total perceived* | 149945,50€ |
Name | Martínez Ten, Carmen |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Presidenta del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 29/12/2012 |
Start date of perception | 02/01/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/01/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 6546,82€ |
Total perceived* | 157123,60€ |
Name | Plana Dropez, Marta |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera de la Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 06/07/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/08/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/08/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 8016,29€ |
Total perceived* | 192390,96€ |
Name | Companys Sanfeliu, Ramon |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4693,13€ |
Total perceived* | 112635,12€ |
Name | Lorenzo Almendros, Bernardo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Presidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 9389,94€ |
Total perceived* | 225358,56€ |
Name | Diez Martin, Luis Miguel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7053,95€ |
Total perceived* | 169294,80€ |
Name | Batalla Bejerano, Joan |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Energía |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7814,80€ |
Total perceived* | 187555,20€ |
Name | Varela Flores, Manuel Guillermo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4693,13€ |
Total perceived* | 112635,12€ |
Name | Gonzalez Lopez, Maria Jesus |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional de la Competencia |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7053,95€ |
Total perceived* | 169294,80€ |
Page 1 of 8
* For the cases of ending of the presentation