16 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Plana Dropez, Marta | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera de la Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 06/07/2013 | 02/08/2013 | 01/08/2015 | 8016,29€ | 192390,96€ |
Companys Sanfeliu, Ramon | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 4693,13€ | 112635,12€ |
Lorenzo Almendros, Bernardo | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Presidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 9389,94€ | 225358,56€ |
Diez Martin, Luis Miguel | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7053,95€ | 169294,80€ |
Batalla Bejerano, Joan | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Energía | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7814,80€ | 187555,20€ |
Varela Flores, Manuel Guillermo | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 4693,13€ | 112635,12€ |
Gonzalez Lopez, Maria Jesus | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional de la Competencia | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7053,95€ | 169294,80€ |
Gonzalez Rodriguez, Jose Pascual | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 8016,29€ | 192390,96€ |
Costas Comesaña, Julio | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 01/11/2015 | 7053,95€ | 169294,80€ |
Lafuente Felez, Alberto | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa | Ex Presidente Comisión Nacional de la Energía | 08/10/2013 | 02/11/2013 | 08/10/2015 | 8762,54€ | 203585,34€ |
Name | Plana Dropez, Marta |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera de la Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 06/07/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/08/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/08/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 8016,29€ |
Total perceived* | 192390,96€ |
Name | Companys Sanfeliu, Ramon |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4693,13€ |
Total perceived* | 112635,12€ |
Name | Lorenzo Almendros, Bernardo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Presidente Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 9389,94€ |
Total perceived* | 225358,56€ |
Name | Diez Martin, Luis Miguel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7053,95€ |
Total perceived* | 169294,80€ |
Name | Batalla Bejerano, Joan |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Energía |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7814,80€ |
Total perceived* | 187555,20€ |
Name | Varela Flores, Manuel Guillermo |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional del Sector Postal |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 4693,13€ |
Total perceived* | 112635,12€ |
Name | Gonzalez Lopez, Maria Jesus |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejera Comisión Nacional de la Competencia |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7053,95€ |
Total perceived* | 169294,80€ |
Name | Gonzalez Rodriguez, Jose Pascual |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión del Mercado de las Telecomunicaciones |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 8016,29€ |
Total perceived* | 192390,96€ |
Name | Costas Comesaña, Julio |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Consejero Comisión Nacional de la Competencia |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 7053,95€ |
Total perceived* | 169294,80€ |
Name | Lafuente Felez, Alberto |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía y Empresa |
Position | Ex Presidente Comisión Nacional de la Energía |
Date of cessation | 08/10/2013 |
Start date of perception | 02/11/2013 |
End date of perception* | 08/10/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 8762,54€ |
Total perceived* | 203585,34€ |
Page 1 of 2
* For the cases of ending of the presentation