514 Search results
Name | Senior | Ministry | Date of cessation | Company / Authorized activity | Date of authorization |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Senior | Ministry | Date of cessation | Company / Authorized activity | Date of authorization |
GONZALEZ LAYA, MARIA ARANZAZU | MINISTRA DE ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION | 12/07/2021 | PARIS SCHOOL OF INTERNATIONAL AFFAIRS DE SCIENCES PO | 18/02/2022 |
GONZALEZ LAYA, MARIA ARANZAZU | MINISTRA DE ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION | 12/07/2021 | DANONE SA | 14/02/2022 |
GONZALEZ LAYA, MARIA ARANZAZU | MINISTRA DE ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION | 12/07/2021 | ESCUELA DE GOBERNANZA TRANSNACIONAL | 14/02/2022 |
GONZALEZ LAYA, MARIA ARANZAZU | MINISTRA DE ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION | 12/07/2021 | THINK TANK EUROPEAN HOUSE | 14/02/2022 |
DUQUE DUQUE, PEDRO | MINISTRO DE CIENCIA E INNOVACION | CIENCIA E INNOVACION | 12/07/2021 | EJERCICIO PROFESION INGENIERO AERONAUTICO. CLIENTE HERIUS CAPITAL | 18/04/2022 |
DUQUE DUQUE, PEDRO | MINISTRO DE CIENCIA E INNOVACION | CIENCIA E INNOVACION | 12/07/2021 | EJERCICIO PROFESION INGENIERO AERONAUTICO. CLIENTE PRINCIPAL FUNDACION LA CAIXA | 25/04/2022 |
CONESA PAGES, MARIA MERCE | PRESIDENTA DE LA AUTORIDAD PORTUARIA DE BARCELONA | FOMENTO | 02/07/2021 | BARCELONA GLOBAL | 04/05/2023 |
ULLOA PIÑEIRO, ANA | DIRECTORA DE LA AUTORIDAD PORTUARIA DE CASTELLON (OPE) | FOMENTO | 01/07/2021 | ADMINISTRADORA APORTA CONSULTORES ESTRATEGICOS, S.L | 15/07/2021 |
ARCHILLA FERNANDEZ, FERNANDO | DIRECTOR GENERAL DE CORREOS TELECOM | GRUPO SEPI | 07/06/2021 | JEFE DE PROYECTOS EN GESTELCOM SERVICIOS | 15/09/2021 |
MARTINEZ GIMENO, JOSE MIGUEL | DIRECTOR GENERAL DEL SERVICIO JURIDICO DE LA CNMV | ASUNTOS ECONOMICOS Y TRANSFORMACION DIGITAL | 31/05/2021 | URIA MENENDEZ ABOGADOS, SLP | 19/05/2021 |
Name | GONZALEZ LAYA, MARIA ARANZAZU |
---|---|
Senior | MINISTRA DE ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION |
Ministry | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION |
Date of cessation | 12/07/2021 |
Company / Authorized activity | PARIS SCHOOL OF INTERNATIONAL AFFAIRS DE SCIENCES PO |
Date of authorization | 18/02/2022 |
Name | GONZALEZ LAYA, MARIA ARANZAZU |
Senior | MINISTRA DE ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION |
Ministry | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION |
Date of cessation | 12/07/2021 |
Company / Authorized activity | DANONE SA |
Date of authorization | 14/02/2022 |
Name | GONZALEZ LAYA, MARIA ARANZAZU |
Senior | MINISTRA DE ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION |
Ministry | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION |
Date of cessation | 12/07/2021 |
Company / Authorized activity | ESCUELA DE GOBERNANZA TRANSNACIONAL |
Date of authorization | 14/02/2022 |
Name | GONZALEZ LAYA, MARIA ARANZAZU |
Senior | MINISTRA DE ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION |
Ministry | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION |
Date of cessation | 12/07/2021 |
Company / Authorized activity | THINK TANK EUROPEAN HOUSE |
Date of authorization | 14/02/2022 |
Name | DUQUE DUQUE, PEDRO |
Senior | MINISTRO DE CIENCIA E INNOVACION |
Ministry | CIENCIA E INNOVACION |
Date of cessation | 12/07/2021 |
Company / Authorized activity | EJERCICIO PROFESION INGENIERO AERONAUTICO. CLIENTE HERIUS CAPITAL |
Date of authorization | 18/04/2022 |
Name | DUQUE DUQUE, PEDRO |
Senior | MINISTRO DE CIENCIA E INNOVACION |
Ministry | CIENCIA E INNOVACION |
Date of cessation | 12/07/2021 |
Company / Authorized activity | EJERCICIO PROFESION INGENIERO AERONAUTICO. CLIENTE PRINCIPAL FUNDACION LA CAIXA |
Date of authorization | 25/04/2022 |
Name | CONESA PAGES, MARIA MERCE |
Senior | PRESIDENTA DE LA AUTORIDAD PORTUARIA DE BARCELONA |
Ministry | FOMENTO |
Date of cessation | 02/07/2021 |
Company / Authorized activity | BARCELONA GLOBAL |
Date of authorization | 04/05/2023 |
Name | ULLOA PIÑEIRO, ANA |
Senior | DIRECTORA DE LA AUTORIDAD PORTUARIA DE CASTELLON (OPE) |
Ministry | FOMENTO |
Date of cessation | 01/07/2021 |
Company / Authorized activity | ADMINISTRADORA APORTA CONSULTORES ESTRATEGICOS, S.L |
Date of authorization | 15/07/2021 |
Name | ARCHILLA FERNANDEZ, FERNANDO |
Senior | DIRECTOR GENERAL DE CORREOS TELECOM |
Ministry | GRUPO SEPI |
Date of cessation | 07/06/2021 |
Company / Authorized activity | JEFE DE PROYECTOS EN GESTELCOM SERVICIOS |
Date of authorization | 15/09/2021 |
Name | MARTINEZ GIMENO, JOSE MIGUEL |
Senior | DIRECTOR GENERAL DEL SERVICIO JURIDICO DE LA CNMV |
Ministry | ASUNTOS ECONOMICOS Y TRANSFORMACION DIGITAL |
Date of cessation | 31/05/2021 |
Company / Authorized activity | URIA MENENDEZ ABOGADOS, SLP |
Date of authorization | 19/05/2021 |
Page 11 of 52