70 Search results
Name | Senior | Ministry | Date of cessation | Company / Authorized activity | Date of authorization |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Senior | Ministry | Date of cessation | Company / Authorized activity | Date of authorization |
TORRES RIESCO, JAVIER | PRESIDENTE EJECUTIVO SAREB | ASUNTOS ECONOMICOS Y TRANSFORMACION DIGITAL | 30/06/2022 | DESPACHO DE ABOGADOS VIEIRA DE ALMEIDA | 08/07/2022 |
AZNAR CANO, ISMAEL | D. GRAL. DE CALIDAD Y EVALUACION AMBIENTAL | TRANSICION ECOLOGICA Y EL RETO DEMOGRAFICO | 28/06/2022 | LANDWELL PRICEWATERHOUSE COOPERS TAX & LEGAL SERVICES, S.L, | 04/07/2022 |
CALVET I VALERA, DAMIA | PRESIDENTE DE LA AUTORIDAD PORTUARIA DE BARCELONA (OPE) | TRANSPORTES, MOVILIDAD Y AGENDA URBANA | 02/12/2022 | OUA GROUP | 07/02/2023 |
RODRIGUEZ MARIN, MARIA DELIA | DIRECTORA DEL DEPARTAMENTO DIGITAL | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO | 21/09/2022 | LA VANGUARDIA EDICIONES SLU | 30/09/2022 |
SOLER SICILIA, ALBERT | D. GRAL. DEPORTES | CULTURA Y DEPORTE | 11/01/2023 | PERSEFONE S.L. | 08/06/2023 |
SOLER SICILIA, ALBERT | D. GRAL. DEPORTES | CULTURA Y DEPORTE | 11/01/2023 | METROPOLITAN SPAIN S.L | 18/04/2023 |
BORJA VILLEL, MANUEL J. | DIRECTOR DEL MUSEO NACIONAL CENTRO DE ARTE REINA SOFIA (MNCARS) (OPE) | CULTURA Y DEPORTE | 19/01/2023 | FUNDACION BIENAL DE SAO PAULO | 26/01/2023 |
CALVET I VALERA, DAMIA | PRESIDENTE DE LA AUTORIDAD PORTUARIA DE BARCELONA (OPE) | TRANSPORTES, MOVILIDAD Y AGENDA URBANA | 02/12/2022 | VERTIX GRUP IMMOBILIARI | 07/02/2023 |
GARCIA-BERDOY CEREZO, JUAN PABLO | EMBAJADOR REPRESENTANTA PERMANENTE ANTE LA UNION EUROPEA | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION | 21/07/2022 | AMERICAN UNIVERSITY | 07/02/2022 |
RODRIGUEZ MARIN, MARIA DELIA | DIRECTORA DEL DEPARTAMENTO DIGITAL | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO | 21/09/2022 | GODO VERTICAL MEDIA, SL | 30/09/2022 |
Name | TORRES RIESCO, JAVIER |
---|---|
Senior | PRESIDENTE EJECUTIVO SAREB |
Ministry | ASUNTOS ECONOMICOS Y TRANSFORMACION DIGITAL |
Date of cessation | 30/06/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | DESPACHO DE ABOGADOS VIEIRA DE ALMEIDA |
Date of authorization | 08/07/2022 |
Name | AZNAR CANO, ISMAEL |
Senior | D. GRAL. DE CALIDAD Y EVALUACION AMBIENTAL |
Ministry | TRANSICION ECOLOGICA Y EL RETO DEMOGRAFICO |
Date of cessation | 28/06/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | LANDWELL PRICEWATERHOUSE COOPERS TAX & LEGAL SERVICES, S.L, |
Date of authorization | 04/07/2022 |
Name | CALVET I VALERA, DAMIA |
Senior | PRESIDENTE DE LA AUTORIDAD PORTUARIA DE BARCELONA (OPE) |
Ministry | TRANSPORTES, MOVILIDAD Y AGENDA URBANA |
Date of cessation | 02/12/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | OUA GROUP |
Date of authorization | 07/02/2023 |
Name | RODRIGUEZ MARIN, MARIA DELIA |
Senior | DIRECTORA DEL DEPARTAMENTO DIGITAL |
Ministry | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO |
Date of cessation | 21/09/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | LA VANGUARDIA EDICIONES SLU |
Date of authorization | 30/09/2022 |
Name | SOLER SICILIA, ALBERT |
Senior | D. GRAL. DEPORTES |
Ministry | CULTURA Y DEPORTE |
Date of cessation | 11/01/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | PERSEFONE S.L. |
Date of authorization | 08/06/2023 |
Name | SOLER SICILIA, ALBERT |
Senior | D. GRAL. DEPORTES |
Ministry | CULTURA Y DEPORTE |
Date of cessation | 11/01/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | METROPOLITAN SPAIN S.L |
Date of authorization | 18/04/2023 |
Name | BORJA VILLEL, MANUEL J. |
Senior | DIRECTOR DEL MUSEO NACIONAL CENTRO DE ARTE REINA SOFIA (MNCARS) (OPE) |
Ministry | CULTURA Y DEPORTE |
Date of cessation | 19/01/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | FUNDACION BIENAL DE SAO PAULO |
Date of authorization | 26/01/2023 |
Name | CALVET I VALERA, DAMIA |
Senior | PRESIDENTE DE LA AUTORIDAD PORTUARIA DE BARCELONA (OPE) |
Ministry | TRANSPORTES, MOVILIDAD Y AGENDA URBANA |
Date of cessation | 02/12/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | VERTIX GRUP IMMOBILIARI |
Date of authorization | 07/02/2023 |
Name | GARCIA-BERDOY CEREZO, JUAN PABLO |
Senior | EMBAJADOR REPRESENTANTA PERMANENTE ANTE LA UNION EUROPEA |
Ministry | ASUNTOS EXTERIORES, UNION EUROPEA Y COOPERACION |
Date of cessation | 21/07/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | AMERICAN UNIVERSITY |
Date of authorization | 07/02/2022 |
Name | RODRIGUEZ MARIN, MARIA DELIA |
Senior | DIRECTORA DEL DEPARTAMENTO DIGITAL |
Ministry | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO |
Date of cessation | 21/09/2022 |
Company / Authorized activity | GODO VERTICAL MEDIA, SL |
Date of authorization | 30/09/2022 |
Page 7 of 7