70 Search results
Name | Senior | Ministry | Date of cessation | Company / Authorized activity | Date of authorization |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Senior | Ministry | Date of cessation | Company / Authorized activity | Date of authorization |
BENGOECHEA MARTI, IGNACIO | SEGUNDO JEFE DEL ESTADO MAYOR DEL EJERCITO DEL AIRE Y DEL ESPACIO | DEFENSA | 22/02/2023 | ELA AVIATION | 26/10/2023 |
BENGOECHEA MARTI, IGNACIO | SEGUNDO JEFE DEL ESTADO MAYOR DEL EJERCITO DEL AIRE Y DEL ESPACIO | DEFENSA | 22/02/2023 | AIRBUS DEFENSE & SPACE | 31/08/2023 |
SOLER SICILIA, ALBERT | D. GRAL. DEPORTES | CULTURA Y DEPORTE | 11/01/2023 | INSTITUTO UNIVERSITARIO AMERIKE S.C. | 08/06/2023 |
SOLER SICILIA, ALBERT | D. GRAL. DEPORTES | CULTURA Y DEPORTE | 11/01/2023 | ESCOLA SALUT I ESPORT S.L. | 08/06/2023 |
CANEDO ARRILLAGA, PILAR | CONSEJERA DE LA COMISION NACIONAL DE LOS MERCADOS Y LA COMPETENCIA | ASUNTOS ECONOMICOS Y TRANSFORMACION DIGITAL | 26/07/2023 | UNIVERSIDAD CARLOS III | 28/08/2023 |
GAYO RODRIGUEZ, CARMEN | D. DE LA OFICINA DEL ALTO COMISIONADO PARA LA LUCHA CONTRA LA POBREZA INFANTIL | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO | 07/06/2023 | ACCION CONTRA EL HAMBRE | 18/09/2023 |
PARDO DE VERA POSADA, ISABEL | SECRETARIA DE ESTADO DE TRANSPORTES, MOVILIDAD Y AGENDA URBANA | TRANSPORTES, MOVILIDAD Y AGENDA URBANA | 22/02/2023 | FTI CONSULTING INC | 25/01/2024 |
GARZON ESPINOSA, ALBERTO CARLOS | MINISTRO DE CONSUMO | CONSUMO | 21/11/2023 | ALANIS | 25/03/2024 |
BISBAL PONS, FRANCISCO DE PAULA | DIRECTOR DEL CENTRO SUPERIOR DE ESTUDIOS DE LA DEFENSA NACIONAL (CESEDEN) | DEFENSA | 28/12/2023 | GENERAL DE ALQUILER DE MAQUINARIA | 15/03/2024 |
VAZQUEZ ALARCON, FIDEL | D. GRAL. DE LA ENTIDAD PUBLICA EMPRESARIAL DEL SUELO (SEPES) (EPE) | TRANSPORTES, MOVILIDAD Y AGENDA URBANA | 08/12/2023 | ROCA CORPORACION EMPRESARIAL | 01/03/2024 |
Name | BENGOECHEA MARTI, IGNACIO |
---|---|
Senior | SEGUNDO JEFE DEL ESTADO MAYOR DEL EJERCITO DEL AIRE Y DEL ESPACIO |
Ministry | DEFENSA |
Date of cessation | 22/02/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | ELA AVIATION |
Date of authorization | 26/10/2023 |
Name | BENGOECHEA MARTI, IGNACIO |
Senior | SEGUNDO JEFE DEL ESTADO MAYOR DEL EJERCITO DEL AIRE Y DEL ESPACIO |
Ministry | DEFENSA |
Date of cessation | 22/02/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | AIRBUS DEFENSE & SPACE |
Date of authorization | 31/08/2023 |
Name | SOLER SICILIA, ALBERT |
Senior | D. GRAL. DEPORTES |
Ministry | CULTURA Y DEPORTE |
Date of cessation | 11/01/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | INSTITUTO UNIVERSITARIO AMERIKE S.C. |
Date of authorization | 08/06/2023 |
Name | SOLER SICILIA, ALBERT |
Senior | D. GRAL. DEPORTES |
Ministry | CULTURA Y DEPORTE |
Date of cessation | 11/01/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | ESCOLA SALUT I ESPORT S.L. |
Date of authorization | 08/06/2023 |
Name | CANEDO ARRILLAGA, PILAR |
Senior | CONSEJERA DE LA COMISION NACIONAL DE LOS MERCADOS Y LA COMPETENCIA |
Ministry | ASUNTOS ECONOMICOS Y TRANSFORMACION DIGITAL |
Date of cessation | 26/07/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | UNIVERSIDAD CARLOS III |
Date of authorization | 28/08/2023 |
Name | GAYO RODRIGUEZ, CARMEN |
Senior | D. DE LA OFICINA DEL ALTO COMISIONADO PARA LA LUCHA CONTRA LA POBREZA INFANTIL |
Ministry | PRESIDENCIA DEL GOBIERNO |
Date of cessation | 07/06/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | ACCION CONTRA EL HAMBRE |
Date of authorization | 18/09/2023 |
Name | PARDO DE VERA POSADA, ISABEL |
Senior | SECRETARIA DE ESTADO DE TRANSPORTES, MOVILIDAD Y AGENDA URBANA |
Ministry | TRANSPORTES, MOVILIDAD Y AGENDA URBANA |
Date of cessation | 22/02/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | FTI CONSULTING INC |
Date of authorization | 25/01/2024 |
Name | GARZON ESPINOSA, ALBERTO CARLOS |
Senior | MINISTRO DE CONSUMO |
Ministry | CONSUMO |
Date of cessation | 21/11/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | ALANIS |
Date of authorization | 25/03/2024 |
Name | BISBAL PONS, FRANCISCO DE PAULA |
Senior | DIRECTOR DEL CENTRO SUPERIOR DE ESTUDIOS DE LA DEFENSA NACIONAL (CESEDEN) |
Ministry | DEFENSA |
Date of cessation | 28/12/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | GENERAL DE ALQUILER DE MAQUINARIA |
Date of authorization | 15/03/2024 |
Name | VAZQUEZ ALARCON, FIDEL |
Senior | D. GRAL. DE LA ENTIDAD PUBLICA EMPRESARIAL DEL SUELO (SEPES) (EPE) |
Ministry | TRANSPORTES, MOVILIDAD Y AGENDA URBANA |
Date of cessation | 08/12/2023 |
Company / Authorized activity | ROCA CORPORACION EMPRESARIAL |
Date of authorization | 01/03/2024 |
Page 4 of 7