18 Search results
Name | Senior | Ministry | Date of cessation | Company / Authorized activity | Date of authorization |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Senior | Ministry | Date of cessation | Company / Authorized activity | Date of authorization |
CATALA POLO, RAFAEL | MINISTRO DE JUSTICA | JUSTICIA | 01/06/2018 | ABOGADO DEL COLEGIO DE ABOGADOS DE MADRID | 23/11/2018 |
CATALA POLO, RAFAEL | MINISTRO DE JUSTICA | JUSTICIA | 01/06/2018 | MIEMBRO DEL PATRONATO DE LA FUNDACION ATLETICO DE MADRID | 26/11/2018 |
CATALA POLO, RAFAEL | MINISTRO DE JUSTICA | JUSTICIA | 01/06/2018 | MIEMBRO DEL PATRONATO DE LA FUNDACION LEGALITAS | 26/11/2018 |
CATALA POLO, RAFAEL | MINISTRO DE JUSTICA | JUSTICIA | 01/06/2018 | SENIOR ADVISOR EN HERBERT SMITH FREEHILLS SPAIN | 26/11/2018 |
CATALA POLO, RAFAEL | MINISTRO DE JUSTICIA | JUSTICIA | 01/06/2018 | PRESIDENTE Y CONSEJERO DE BELAGUA 2013, S.A. | 13/06/2019 |
CATALA POLO, RAFAEL | MINISTRO DE JUSTICIA | JUSTICIA | 01/06/2018 | SENIOR ADVISOR EN KREAB | 18/07/2019 |
AMERIGO ALONSO, JOSE | SECRETARIO GENERAL TECNICO | JUSTICIA | 21/01/2020 | LANDWELL-PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS TAX&LEGAL SERVICES, S.L. | 21/01/2020 |
BUENO SANCHEZ, JOSE MIGUEL | SUBSECRETARIO DE JUSTICIA | JUSTICIA | 01/09/2021 | AYALA DE LA TORRE ABOGADOS | 23/12/2022 |
Name | CATALA POLO, RAFAEL |
---|---|
Senior | MINISTRO DE JUSTICA |
Ministry | JUSTICIA |
Date of cessation | 01/06/2018 |
Company / Authorized activity | ABOGADO DEL COLEGIO DE ABOGADOS DE MADRID |
Date of authorization | 23/11/2018 |
Name | CATALA POLO, RAFAEL |
Senior | MINISTRO DE JUSTICA |
Ministry | JUSTICIA |
Date of cessation | 01/06/2018 |
Company / Authorized activity | MIEMBRO DEL PATRONATO DE LA FUNDACION ATLETICO DE MADRID |
Date of authorization | 26/11/2018 |
Name | CATALA POLO, RAFAEL |
Senior | MINISTRO DE JUSTICA |
Ministry | JUSTICIA |
Date of cessation | 01/06/2018 |
Company / Authorized activity | MIEMBRO DEL PATRONATO DE LA FUNDACION LEGALITAS |
Date of authorization | 26/11/2018 |
Name | CATALA POLO, RAFAEL |
Senior | MINISTRO DE JUSTICA |
Ministry | JUSTICIA |
Date of cessation | 01/06/2018 |
Company / Authorized activity | SENIOR ADVISOR EN HERBERT SMITH FREEHILLS SPAIN |
Date of authorization | 26/11/2018 |
Name | CATALA POLO, RAFAEL |
Senior | MINISTRO DE JUSTICIA |
Ministry | JUSTICIA |
Date of cessation | 01/06/2018 |
Company / Authorized activity | PRESIDENTE Y CONSEJERO DE BELAGUA 2013, S.A. |
Date of authorization | 13/06/2019 |
Name | CATALA POLO, RAFAEL |
Senior | MINISTRO DE JUSTICIA |
Ministry | JUSTICIA |
Date of cessation | 01/06/2018 |
Company / Authorized activity | SENIOR ADVISOR EN KREAB |
Date of authorization | 18/07/2019 |
Name | AMERIGO ALONSO, JOSE |
Senior | SECRETARIO GENERAL TECNICO |
Ministry | JUSTICIA |
Date of cessation | 21/01/2020 |
Company / Authorized activity | LANDWELL-PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS TAX&LEGAL SERVICES, S.L. |
Date of authorization | 21/01/2020 |
Name | BUENO SANCHEZ, JOSE MIGUEL |
Senior | SUBSECRETARIO DE JUSTICIA |
Ministry | JUSTICIA |
Date of cessation | 01/09/2021 |
Company / Authorized activity | AYALA DE LA TORRE ABOGADOS |
Date of authorization | 23/12/2022 |
Page 2 of 2