73 Search results
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name | Ministry | Position | Date of cessation | Start date of perception | End date of perception* | Monthly Perception | Total perceived* |
Navia Simón, Daniel | Ministerio de Energía, Turismo y Agenda Digital | Ex Secretario de Estado de Energía | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 01/11/2018 | 6549,33€ | 32746,65€ |
Vela Olmo, Carmen | Ministerio de Economía, Industria y Competitividad | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Investigación, Desarrollo e Innovación | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 31/08/2018 | 6549,33€ | 13098,66€ |
Bermúdez De Castro Mur, Roberto | Ministerio de la Presidencia y para las Administraciones Territoriales | Ex Secretario de Estado para las Administraciones Territoriales | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 15/10/2018 | 6549,33€ | 22922,65€ |
Martínez Ten, Carmen | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Presidenta del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear | 29/12/2012 | 02/01/2013 | 01/01/2015 | 6546,82€ | 157123,60€ |
Argüelles Salaverría, Pedro | Ministerio de Defensa | Ex Secretario de Estado de Defensa | 19/11/2016 | 02/12/2016 | 17/02/2017 | 6438,38€ | 16391,98€ |
Cardenal Carro, Miguel | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes | 19/11/2016 | 02/12/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 6438,38€ | 57499,17€ |
Beteta Barreda, Antonio Germán | Ministerio de Hacienda y Administraciones Publicas | Ex Secretario de Estado de Administraciones Públicas | 18/11/2016 | 01/12/2016 | 30/11/2018 | 6438,38€ | 154629,62€ |
Calvo-Sotelo Ibáñez-Martín, Víctor | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo | Ex Secretario de Estado de Telecomunicaciones y para la Sociedad de la Información | 18/11/2016 | 01/12/2016 | 01/11/2018 | 6438,38€ | 154629,62€ |
Burgos Gallego, Tomás | Ministerio de Empleo y Seguridad Social | Ex Secretario de la Seguridad Social | 18/06/2018 | 01/07/2018 | 17/06/2019 | 6363,42€ | 76361,04€ |
Jimenez Latorre, Fernando | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad | Ex Secretario de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa | 30/08/2014 | 02/09/2014 | 01/11/2014 | 6311,40€ | 12622,80€ |
Name | Navia Simón, Daniel |
---|---|
Ministry | Ministerio de Energía, Turismo y Agenda Digital |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Energía |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6549,33€ |
Total perceived* | 32746,65€ |
Name | Vela Olmo, Carmen |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economía, Industria y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Secretaria de Estado de Investigación, Desarrollo e Innovación |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 31/08/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6549,33€ |
Total perceived* | 13098,66€ |
Name | Bermúdez De Castro Mur, Roberto |
Ministry | Ministerio de la Presidencia y para las Administraciones Territoriales |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado para las Administraciones Territoriales |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 15/10/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6549,33€ |
Total perceived* | 22922,65€ |
Name | Martínez Ten, Carmen |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Presidenta del Consejo de Seguridad Nuclear |
Date of cessation | 29/12/2012 |
Start date of perception | 02/01/2013 |
End date of perception* | 01/01/2015 |
Monthly Perception | 6546,82€ |
Total perceived* | 157123,60€ |
Name | Argüelles Salaverría, Pedro |
Ministry | Ministerio de Defensa |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Defensa |
Date of cessation | 19/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 02/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 17/02/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 16391,98€ |
Name | Cardenal Carro, Miguel |
Ministry | Ministerio de Educación, Cultura y Deporte |
Position | Ex Presidente del Consejo Superior de Deportes |
Date of cessation | 19/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 02/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 31/08/2017 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 57499,17€ |
Name | Beteta Barreda, Antonio Germán |
Ministry | Ministerio de Hacienda y Administraciones Publicas |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Administraciones Públicas |
Date of cessation | 18/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 01/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 30/11/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 154629,62€ |
Name | Calvo-Sotelo Ibáñez-Martín, Víctor |
Ministry | Ministerio de Industria, Energia y Turismo |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Telecomunicaciones y para la Sociedad de la Información |
Date of cessation | 18/11/2016 |
Start date of perception | 01/12/2016 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2018 |
Monthly Perception | 6438,38€ |
Total perceived* | 154629,62€ |
Name | Burgos Gallego, Tomás |
Ministry | Ministerio de Empleo y Seguridad Social |
Position | Ex Secretario de la Seguridad Social |
Date of cessation | 18/06/2018 |
Start date of perception | 01/07/2018 |
End date of perception* | 17/06/2019 |
Monthly Perception | 6363,42€ |
Total perceived* | 76361,04€ |
Name | Jimenez Latorre, Fernando |
Ministry | Ministerio de Economia y Competitividad |
Position | Ex Secretario de Estado de Economía y Apoyo a la Empresa |
Date of cessation | 30/08/2014 |
Start date of perception | 02/09/2014 |
End date of perception* | 01/11/2014 |
Monthly Perception | 6311,40€ |
Total perceived* | 12622,80€ |
Page 5 of 8
* For the cases of ending of the presentation